Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José García Alvaro

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1701³Born
25 May 175048.7AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
12 Jul 175048.8Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
Jan 1784³82.3DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan José García Alvaro
Bishop Juan José García Alvaro (born , died Jan 1784) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudia

  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 68, Number 325
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast