Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban Villanova Colomer

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1708³BornOlot
17 May 175142.7AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
29 Jun 175142.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
4 Aug 175546.9AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
13 Apr 176657.6DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Esteban Villanova Colomer:
Bishop Esteban Villanova Colomer (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 70, Number 333
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 239, and Page 409

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015