Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego González Toro y Villalobos

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1675³BornJérez de los Caballeros
30 May 171136.4Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 172550.8AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
20 Mar 172651.2Ordained BishopBishop of Málaga, Spain
5 May 173459.3AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
13 Sep 173762.6DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego González Toro y Villalobos:
Bishop Diego González Toro y Villalobos (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 253
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,471
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,018
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 44, Number 169
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 51
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015