Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elliott Griffin Thomas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1926Born
6 Jun 198659.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
30 Oct 199367.2AppointedBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
12 Dec 199367.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
29 Jun 199972.9ResignedBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
28 Feb 201992.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA

MicroData Summary for Elliott Griffin Thomas
Bishop Elliott Griffin Thomas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, PA, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Saint Thomas, Diocese of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands
Death PlaceSt. John Neumann Residence (Stella Maris), Timonium, MD, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Buried Place (Original)Western No. 1, Cemetery, Saint Thomas, Diocese of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,183
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d/loc: CB, 1 Mar 2019
  • loc: CB, 4 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 5 Mar 2019

Quantcast