Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Miossens de Sansons

Deceased

Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Apr 1652SelectedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
13 Nov 1652ConfirmedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
9 Feb 1653Ordained BishopBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
8 Feb 1658DiedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Miossens de Sansons:
Bishop Jean de Miossens de Sansons (died ) Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 264
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015