Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Freire de Oliveira Neto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1928BornApodí
22 Sep 195628.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 197345.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
3 Nov 197345.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Illici
2 Jun 197446.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Illici
21 May 197951.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
14 Mar 198456.0SucceededBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
15 Jun 200476.2RetiredBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
10 Jan 201283.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Freire de Oliveira Neto:
Bishop José Freire de Oliveira Neto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mossoró

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 10 Jan 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015