Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélémy Malunga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1912Born
21 Apr 194634.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Jul 196957.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Jul 196957.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
29 Nov 196957.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburnica
11 Mar 197159.1AppointedBishop of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Jan 199078.0RetiredBishop of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Mar 199583.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kamina, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Barthélémy Malunga
Bishop Barthélémy Malunga (born 1912, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kamina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManga
Ordained BishopKolwezi

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 468

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 3 Dec 2020

Quantcast