Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc Mallier du Houssay

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹Born
13 Apr 166830.2SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
3 Sep 166830.6ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
25 Nov 166830.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
3 May 167537.3DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marc Mallier du Houssay
Bishop Marc Mallier du Houssay (born 1638, died ) Bishop of Tarbes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenise

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast