Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jo„o Aparecido Bergamasco, S.A.C.

Bishop of CorumbŠ, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1967 Born
25 Mar 199325.8ProfessedMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
26 Dec 199326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
19 Dec 201851.5AppointedBishop of CorumbŠ, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
3 Mar 201951.8Ordained BishopBishop of CorumbŠ, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
23 Mar 201951.8InstalledBishop of CorumbŠ, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jo„o Aparecido Bergamasco
Bishop Jo„o Aparecido Bergamasco S.A.C. (born ) Bishop of CorumbŠ

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuneiras do Oeste, Diocese of Campo Mour„o, Parana
Ordained BishopDivino Espirito Santo, Cathedral, Umuarama, Diocese of Umuarama, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of CorumbŠ.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Dec 2018
  • c34: CB, 26 Jan 2019
  • i: AM, 8 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast