Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Mantilla Duarte, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ipiales


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1925BornPiedecuesta
9 Jul 194216.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Feb 194822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Jan 197145.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sibundoy, Colombia
16 Jan 197145.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Oppidum Consilinum
13 Mar 197145.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oppidum Consilinum
26 Apr 197751.7AppointedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
25 Oct 198560.2AppointedBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
16 Jan 198761.4ResignedBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
16 Mar 200983.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ipiales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ramón Mantilla Duarte:
Bishop Ramón Mantilla Duarte C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ipiales

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015