Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marius Macrionitis, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

Apostolic Administrator of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia

Apostolic Administrator of Thessaloniki


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1913Born
15 Jul 194127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
14 Jun 195238.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Corfù, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
11 Mar 195339.4AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
11 Mar 195339.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Thessaloniki, Greece
10 May 195339.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
8 Apr 195945.5DiedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Marius Macrionitis
Archbishop Marius Macrionitis S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Athēnai {Athens}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVaris

  • a priest for 17.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1960
  • c2+: CB
  • aadm: CB, 3 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 5 Sep 2018

Quantcast