Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges Calavassy

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)

Titular Bishop of Theodoropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1881Born
29 Jun 190625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Syros (e Milos), Greece
13 Jul 192039.4AppointedApostolic Exarch of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey
13 Jul 192039.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Theodoropolis
15 Aug 192039.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theodoropolis
11 Jun 193251.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)
7 Nov 195776.7DiedApostolic Exarch of Greece (Greek)

MicroData Summary for Georges Calavassy
Bishop Georges Calavassy (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch of Greece

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSyros

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 5 Sep 2018

Quantcast