Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edmund Fitzmaurice

Deceased

Bishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1839Born
21 Dec 186223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Dec 189758.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
14 Dec 189758.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amisus
24 Feb 189859.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amisus
15 Sep 189960.6SucceededBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Jun 192081.4DiedBishop of Erie, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Edmund Fitzmaurice
Bishop John Edmund Fitzmaurice (born , died ) Bishop of Erie

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoyvane, Newtownsandes, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Philadelphia, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceErie, Diocese of Erie, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 96, and Page 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jun 2017