Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Michael Hill

Deceased

Bishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1899Born
24 Jun 192323.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 194646.6AppointedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
25 Jul 194646.7Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
29 Mar 196262.4DiedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Michael Hill
Bishop James Michael Hill (born , died ) Bishop of Victoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChatham

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018