Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Menzies Strain

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1810Born
9 Jun 183322.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Sep 186453.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern District, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Sep 186453.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
25 Sep 186453.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
15 Mar 187867.2AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain
2 Jul 188372.5DiedArchbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Menzies Strain
Archbishop John Menzies Strain (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews and Edinburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdinburgh
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69, and Page 101
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Feb 2017