Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Léon Landry

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hearst, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1895BornPomquet
24 Jun 192125.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 194650.2AppointedBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
1 May 194650.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
21 May 194650.5InstalledBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
14 Jan 195256.1ResignedBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
14 Jan 195256.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cnossus
27 Nov 197075.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Cnossus
29 Dec 197782.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Hearst, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Georges-Léon Landry:
Bishop Georges-Léon Landry (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hearst

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013