Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Medina Cachón y Ponce de León

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630²BornMayorga de Campos
16 Dec 167546.0AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
Aug 1676³46.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
9 Dec 168050.9AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
5 Feb 168555.1SelectedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
8 Apr 168555.3ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
20 Sep 169464.7DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Medina Cachón y Ponce de León:
Bishop Antonio Medina Cachón y Ponce de León (died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 145, and Page 247
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 354
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 214, Number 1,333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013