Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Porras y Atienza

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1627BornCabra
165326.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 168154.3AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
24 Apr 168457.3AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
28 Jul 170477.6DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Porras y Atienza:
Bishop Juan de Porras y Atienza (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a priest for 51.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 152, and Page 354
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 222, Number 1,379

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013