Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Talbot

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1618Born
16 Mar 164728.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jun 164829.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 166950.6AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
12 May 166950.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
15 Nov 168062.3DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Peter Talbot
Archbishop Peter Talbot (born , died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalahide
Ordained BishopAntwerpen, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 188
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 7
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast