Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Inácio Lucas Mwita

Bishop-Elect of Gurué, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1969 Born
21 Jun 199828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Nacala, Mozambique
2 Feb 202151.3AppointedBishop of Gurué, Mozambique
21 Mar 202151.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gurué, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Inácio Lucas Mwita
Father Inácio Lucas Mwita (born ) Bishop-Elect of Gurué

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapaco, Diocese of Nampula
Ordained BishopGurué, Diocese of Gurué

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Gurué.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast