Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Edward Drennan

Bishop Emeritus of Palmerston North, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1960 Born
14 Jun 199635.8Ordained PriestPriest of Christchurch, New Zealand
22 Feb 201150.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand
11 Jun 201150.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand
22 Feb 201251.4SucceededBishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand
4 Oct 201959.1ResignedBishop of Palmerston North, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Charles Edward Drennan
Bishop Charles Edward Drennan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Palmerston North

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChristchurch, Diocese of Christchurch
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Cathedral, Palmerston North, Diocese of Palmerston North

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palmerston North.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,075
  • s: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 29 Nov 2019

Quantcast