Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Andrew Gielen

Auxiliary Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand

Titular Bishop of Abbir Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1971 Born
29 Nov 199726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton in New Zealand
6 Jan 202048.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand
6 Jan 202048.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
7 Mar 202048.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius

MicroData Summary for Michael Andrew Gielen
Bishop Michael Andrew Gielen (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Auckland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCambridge, Diocese of Auckland
Ordained BishopVodafone Events Centre, Manukau, Diocese of Auckland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Auckland.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2020
  • ob: CB, 14 Jan 2020
  • c2: CB, 17 Feb 2020
  • c34: CB, 6 Mar 2020
  • c1: CB, 10 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast