Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Ballerini

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1857Born
23 Sep 188225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pavia, Italy
26 Jul 192466.8AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
28 Oct 192467.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
12 Nov 192467.1InstalledBishop of Pavia, Italy
22 Jun 193375.7DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ballerini
Bishop Giuseppe Ballerini (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGualdrasco

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast