Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis-Jacques d’Audibert de Lussan

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1703Born
8 Nov 174340.5SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
16 Mar 174440.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
12 Apr 174440.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
28 Nov 174542.5InstalledArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
15 Nov 176966.5DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Jacques d’Audibert de Lussan
Archbishop Louis-Jacques d’Audibert de Lussan (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaix, Ardèche

  • a bishop for 25.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1744, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast