Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alonso Marcos de Llanes Argüelles

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1732BornNoreña
6 Jun 177442.1AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
28 Aug 177442.3Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
15 Dec 178351.6AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
7 Jan 179562.7DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alonso Marcos de Llanes Argüelles: VIAF:36562355
Archbishop Alonso Marcos de Llanes Argüelles (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 238, and Page 373
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 91, Number 468

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013