Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Cayetano Adsor Paredes

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies

Titular Archbishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1724³BornBarcelona, Spain
1 Mar 177954.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
30 May 177954.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
30 Dec 178157.4SelectedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
25 Feb 178257.5ConfirmedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
12 Jul 178257.9DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Adsor Paredes:
Patriarch Cayetano Adsor Paredes (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 244, and Page 374
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 95, Number 491
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015