Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gavino Valladares y Mejía, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1725BornAracena
11 Sep 177549.8AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
29 Oct 177550.0Ordained BishopBishop of Barcelona, Spain
13 Feb 179468.3DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gavino Valladares y Mejía:
Bishop Gavino Valladares y Mejía O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 92, Number 472
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 46
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015