Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel González Bobela

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

Titular Bishop of Carystus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1706BornValduno
4 Mar 177164.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
4 Mar 177164.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
29 Jun 177164.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
Nov 1775³69.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel González Bobela:
Bishop Miguel González Bobela (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 88, Number 448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013