Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celso Yegros Estigarribia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carapeguá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1935BornItauguá
18 Dec 196025.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 198347.7AppointedBishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay
29 May 198347.9Ordained BishopBishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay
10 Jul 201075.0RetiredBishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay
6 Apr 201377.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Carapeguá, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Celso Yegros Estigarribia:
Bishop Celso Yegros Estigarribia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Carapeguá

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2010
  • d: CB, 6 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013