Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Tomaka

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1875BornTrzebowisko
8 Jun 189924.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 193358.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
25 Nov 193358.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
21 Jan 193458.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
196488.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
6 Feb 196791.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Tomaka:
Bishop Wojciech Tomaka (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 67.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013