Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Hercule de Lévis-Ventadour

Deceased

Bishop of Mirepoix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613¹Born
16 May 165542.3SelectedBishop of Mirepoix, France
25 Oct 165542.8ConfirmedBishop of Mirepoix, France
19 Dec 165542.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
6 Jan 167966.0DiedBishop of Mirepoix, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Hercule de Lévis-Ventadour:
Bishop Louis-Hercule de Lévis-Ventadour (died ) Bishop of Mirepoix

  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015