Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnauld-François de Maytie

Deceased

Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612¹BornMauléon
11 Apr 165947.3SelectedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
1 Sep 165947.7ConfirmedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
27 Apr 166149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France
2 Jul 168169.5DiedBishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arnauld-François de Maytie:
Bishop Arnauld-François de Maytie (died ) Bishop of Oloron (Oloron-Sainte-Marie)

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013