Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Langle

Deceased

Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1644BornÉvreux
26 Apr 169854.1SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
15 Sep 169854.5ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
14 Dec 169854.7Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
12 Apr 172480.0DiedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Langle:
Bishop Pierre de Langle (born , died ) Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015