Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Marie Picaud

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

Titular Bishop of Alba Maritima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1878BornJosselin
20 Dec 190022.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 192547.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vannes, France
15 May 192547.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
1 Jul 192547.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
12 Sep 193153.6AppointedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
5 Aug 195476.5RetiredBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
5 Aug 195476.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Alba Maritima
29 Mar 196082.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie Picaud:
Bishop François-Marie Picaud (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013