Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Louis Pourroy de L’Auberivière

Deceased

Bishop of Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1711BornGrenoble, France
21 Sep 173524.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Mar 173927.7SelectedBishop of Québec, Canada
20 Jul 173928.0ConfirmedBishop of Québec, Canada
16 Aug 173928.1Ordained BishopBishop of Québec, Canada
20 Aug 174029.1DiedBishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for François-Louis Pourroy de L’Auberivière:
Bishop François-Louis Pourroy de L’Auberivière (born , died ) Bishop of Québec

  • a priest for 4.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015