Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prosper-Marie Billère

Deceased

Bishop of Tarbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1817³BornBertren
29 Oct 184326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tarbes, France
23 Sep 188265.1SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
25 Sep 188265.1ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
30 Nov 188265.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
27 Aug 189982.0DiedBishop of Tarbes, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Prosper-Marie Billère:
Bishop Prosper-Marie Billère (born , died ) Bishop of Tarbes

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 535

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013