Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François de La Marche

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1729BornErgué-Gabéric
6 Apr 175626.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 177242.9SelectedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
7 Sep 177243.1ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
27 Sep 177243.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
25 Nov 180677.3DiedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de La Marche: VIAF:66517375
Bishop Jean-François de La Marche (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015