Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Dunne, S.P.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kitui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1920BornDelvin, Ireland
18 Dec 194424.5Ordained PriestPriest of St. Patrick’s Society for the Foreign Missions
19 Oct 195636.4AppointedPrefect of Kitui, Kenya
16 Nov 196343.4AppointedBishop of Kitui, Kenya
9 Feb 196443.7Ordained BishopBishop of Kitui, Kenya
2 Nov 199575.4RetiredBishop of Kitui, Kenya
31 Mar 200281.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Kitui, Kenya

MicroData Summary for William Dunne:
Bishop William Dunne S.P.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kitui

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Apr 2014