Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Kwambamba Masi

Bishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1960 Born
17 Aug 198625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Mar 201554.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
31 Mar 201554.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Naratcata
7 Jun 201554.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Naratcata
31 Mar 201857.6AppointedBishop of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Kwambamba Masi
Bishop Jean-Pierre Kwambamba Masi (born ) Bishop of Kenge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNgi
Ordained BishopPalais du Peuple, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kenge.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2015
  • b/c2: CB, 28 Apr 2015
  • c34: CB, 8 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,501
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast