Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Boualo Kome

Bishop of Bafang, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1969 Born
11 Dec 199930.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
26 May 201242.8AppointedBishop of Bafang, Cameroon
15 Jul 201243.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bafang, Cameroon
6 Jun 201747.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bafia, Cameroon
11 Jul 202051.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Bafia, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Abraham Boualo Kome
Bishop Abraham Boualo Kome (born ) Bishop of Bafang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoum-ville
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Bafang, Diocese of Bafang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bafang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,503
  • ab: CB, 6 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 11 Jul 2020

Quantcast