Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Koletsi

Deceased

Bishop of Sapë, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1868Born
1 Nov 189022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
21 Sep 191143.6AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
10 Dec 191143.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sapë, Albania
2 Jan 192859.9DiedBishop of Sapë, Albania

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Koletsi
Bishop Giorgio Koletsi (born , died ) Bishop of Sapë

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalmeti

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast