Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rogatus Kimaryo, C.S.Sp.

Bishop of Same, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1956 Born
30 May 198730.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
30 Apr 201053.5AppointedBishop of Same, Tanzania
13 Jun 201053.6Ordained BishopBishop of Same, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Rogatus Kimaryo
Bishop Rogatus Kimaryo C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop of Same

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMkuu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Same.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,656

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast