Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafal Wladyslaw Kiernicki, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Dura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1912Born
4 Sep 193119.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Oct 193422.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
29 Jun 193927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
16 Jan 199178.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
16 Jan 199178.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dura
2 Mar 199178.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dura
22 Nov 199583.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Rafal Wladyslaw Kiernicki
Bishop Rafal Wladyslaw Kiernicki O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKulaczkowce
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lviv, Archdiocese of Lviv

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,392
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,756
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • prof/sole: CB, 11 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast