Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mister Janusz Wiesław Kaleta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1964 Born
4 Jun 198924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
7 Jul 199934.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Atyrau, Kazakhstan
15 Sep 200641.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Phelbes
23 Nov 200642.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phelbes
5 Feb 201146.3AppointedBishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan
7 Dec 201248.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Atyrau, Kazakhstan
15 Jul 201449.7ResignedBishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan
15 Jun 201651.6Laicized

MicroData Summary for Janusz Wiesław Kaleta
Mister Janusz Wiesław Kaleta (born )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLazy, Poland

  • a priest for 27.0 years (Laicized)
  • a bishop for 9.5 years (Laicized)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,281
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast