Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Narciso Cardinal Jubany Arnau

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Barcelona

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1913BornSanta Coloma de Farnés
30 Jul 193925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
24 Nov 195542.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
24 Nov 195542.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
22 Jan 195642.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Phoenicia
7 Feb 196450.4AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
3 Dec 197158.3AppointedArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
5 Mar 197359.5Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197359.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
23 Mar 199076.6RetiredArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
26 Dec 199683.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Narciso Jubany Arnau:
Narciso Cardinal Jubany Arnau (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Barcelona

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
  • a cardinal for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015