Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joan Carrera Planas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain

Titular Bishop of Aliezira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1930Born
11 Jul 195424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
16 Jul 199161.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
16 Jul 199161.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aliezira
22 Sep 199161.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aliezira
3 Oct 200878.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Joan Carrera Planas
Bishop Joan Carrera Planas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCornellá de Llobregat

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,472
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast