Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Albert Joly de Choin

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1702BornBourg-en-Bresse
5 May 173836.3AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
1 Jun 173836.4Ordained BishopBishop of Toulon, France
16 Apr 175957.2DiedBishop of Toulon, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Albert Joly de Choin:
Bishop Louis-Albert Joly de Choin (born , died ) Bishop of Toulon

  • a bishop for 20.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013