Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cyril Rudolph Jarre, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Jinan [Tsinan]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1878BornAhrweiler, Germany
189415.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Aug 190325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 May 192951.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tsinanfu, China
18 May 192951.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
25 Jul 192951.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metropolis in Asia
11 Apr 194668.1AppointedArchbishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China
8 Mar 195274.0DiedArchbishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China

MicroData Summary for Cyril Rudolph Jarre:
Archbishop Cyril Rudolph Jarre O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Jinan [Tsinan]

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015