Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo Jun Ikenaga, S.J.

Archbishop Emeritus of Osaka, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1937 Born
20 Mar 196831.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Nov 199558.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Osaka, Japan
20 Mar 199659.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Osaka, Japan
10 May 199760.1SucceededArchbishop of Osaka, Japan
22 Jun 199760.2InstalledArchbishop of Osaka, Japan
20 Aug 201477.4RetiredArchbishop of Osaka, Japan

MicroData Summary
Leo Jun Ikenaga
Archbishop Leo Jun Ikenaga S.J.
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus of Osaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKobe
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Osaka, Archdiocese of Osaka

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Osaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,712
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025