Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Eugene Hurley

Bishop Emeritus of Darwin, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1940 Born
27 Jun 196424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Port Pirie, Australia
27 Nov 199858.5AppointedBishop of Port Pirie, Australia
12 Feb 199958.8Ordained BishopBishop of Port Pirie, Australia
3 Jul 200767.2AppointedBishop of Darwin, Australia
29 Aug 200767.3InstalledBishop of Darwin, Australia
27 Jun 201878.1RetiredBishop of Darwin, Australia

MicroData Summary for Daniel Eugene Hurley
Bishop Daniel Eugene Hurley (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Darwin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrroroo
Ordained BishopSaint Mark, Cathedral, Port Pirie, Diocese of Port Pirie

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Darwin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,478
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 Jul 2018

Quantcast